Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 19:15:53 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION - v. - DEREK SEEFELDT

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEREK SEEFELDT. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Derek Seefeldt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT CLERK STAMP

JUDGMENT CLERK STAMP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT CLERK STAMP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less