This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 05/01/2020 at 23:09:08 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. BRIAN MISHKO JR. et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIAN MISHKO JR. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Brian Miskho JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) to Extend Time Signed

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) to Extend Time Signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) s&C, aos

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) s&C, aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER extend time

RJI -RE: OTHER extend time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/24/2018; Received: 11/24/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/24/2018; Received: 11/24/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/25/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/25/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) to Extend Time Signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) s&C, aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER extend time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/24/2018; Received: 11/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/24/2018; Received: 11/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/25/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/25/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less