This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:41:09 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. BETHANY KADER

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against BETHANY KADER. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Bethany Kader

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: OTHER Extend Time

RJI -RE: OTHER Extend Time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 02/22/2020; Received: 02/22/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Extend Time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 02/22/2020; Received: 02/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less