This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 16:53:44 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. ANTHONY JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTHONY JOHNSON. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Anthony Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER extend time

RJI -RE: OTHER extend time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER extend time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less