Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 23:26:14 (UTC).

COOPER/FRIEDMAN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. v. ALBERT BODD III

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 COOPER/FRIEDMAN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALBERT BODD III. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0090

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER/FRIEDMAN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. DBA FRIEDMAN ELECTRIC SUPPLY

Defendant

Albert Bodd III DBA K B ELECTRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIKH, PRAGNA

Attorney at SMITH, CARROAD, LEVY & WAN PC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIRMATION Non Military

AFFIRMATION Non Military; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - ALBERT BODD III DBA K B ELECTRIC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - ALBERT BODD III DBA K B ELECTRIC; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non Military; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - ALBERT BODD III DBA K B ELECTRIC; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Parikh, P. - filed by Smith Carroad Levy & Wan PC; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less