This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 01:49:45 (UTC).

Connstance B Drago - v. - None None

Case Summary

On 05/14/2017 Connstance B Drago filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against None None. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Connstance B Drago

Defendant

None None

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARUGIA, JOHANNAH M.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - AMENDED clerk stamp

ORDER - AMENDED clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Filed By: Farugia, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Name Change

RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Name Change; Filed By: Farugia, J.; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Farugia, J.; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Farugia, J.; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Filed By: Farugia, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Name Change; Filed By: Farugia, J.; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Farugia, J.; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Farugia, J.; Filed: 05/14/2017; Received: 05/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less