This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 09:25:31 (UTC).

Condor Capital Corp. v. CALS Investors, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 Condor Capital Corp filed an Other lawsuit against CALS Investors, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Saliann Scarpulla. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Saliann Scarpulla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Condor Capital Corp.

Defendants

Condor Recovery Securitization Trust

Condor HoldCo Securitization Trust

CALS Investors, LLC

First Associates Loan Servicing, LLC

Condor AssetCo Securitization Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NIEHAUS, PAUL R

Attorney at KIRSCH & NIEHAUS PLLC

KIRSCH, EMILY BAB

Attorney at Kirsch & Niehaus PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

GIMMEL, DANIEL

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

ZINK, KATHLEEN ANNE

Attorney at SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP

VAN DUSEN, MATTHEW JAMES

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER, PC

PERRI, CARL M

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision And Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision And Order; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision And Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision And Order; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #001) Transcript of Proceedings on December 11, 2019 with Errata (Motion #001 and #002)

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #001) Transcript of Proceedings on December 11, 2019 with Errata (Motion #001 and #002); Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant First Associates Loan Servicing, LLC's Motio ... show more

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant First Associates Loan Servicing, LLC's Motio ... show more; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001); Filed By: Niehaus, P.; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Ex. D - Notice of Appeal, Jan. 2, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Ex. D - Notice of Appeal, Jan. 2, 2019; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Ex. C - Portfolio Purchase Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C Ex. C - Portfolio Purchase Agreement; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex. B - Complaint, Index No. 650034/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex. B - Complaint, Index No. 650034/2019; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Complaint, Index No. 652700/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Complaint, Index No. 652700/2017; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Chief Administrative Judge Lawrence Marks dated January 14, 2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Chief Administrative Judge Lawrence Marks dated January 14, 2019; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Kirsch, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Kirsch, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kirsch, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Kirsch, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Decision And Order; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Decision And Order; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #001) Transcript of Proceedings on December 11, 2019 with Errata (Motion #001 and #002); Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant First Associates Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to Extend Time to Serve; Filed By: Perri, C.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001); Filed By: Niehaus, P.; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Niehaus, P.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Ex. E - Notice of Entry of Decision & Order entered June 8, 2018; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Ex. D - Notice of Appeal, Jan. 2, 2019; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Ex. C - Portfolio Purchase Agreement; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Ex. B - Complaint, Index No. 650034/2019; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Complaint, Index No. 652700/2017; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Chief Administrative Judge Lawrence Marks dated January 14, 2019; Filed By: Gimmel, D.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Kirsch, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Kirsch, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kirsch, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Kirsch, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less