This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 23:59:41 (UTC).

COMPREHENSIVE REHABILITATION AT WILLIAMSVILLE - v. - Leona Jemiolo et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 COMPREHENSIVE REHABILITATION AT WILLIAMSVILLE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Leona Jemiolo. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMPREHENSIVE REHABILITATION AT WILLIAMSVILLE

Defendants

Leona Jemiolo

Anthony Jemiolo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GANG, JASON ADAM

Attorney at Law Office of Jason Gang

Defendant Attorney

GEORGE, PATRICIA A.

Attorney at Law Offices of Patricia A. George

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: George, P.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E Invoice for Balance Due

EXHIBIT(S) - E Invoice for Balance Due; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: George, P.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: George, P.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for L. Jemiolo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for L. Jemiolo; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for A. Jemiolo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for A. Jemiolo; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: George, P.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Invoice for Balance Due; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Notice Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Admissions Agreement Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Admission Record Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: George, P.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: George, P.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for L. Jemiolo; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for A. Jemiolo; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less