Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 15:42:47 (UTC).

Community Memorial Hospital Inc - v. - Lynnette Murray et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 Community Memorial Hospital Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lynnette Murray. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1233

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Community Memorial Hospital Inc

Defendants

Shawn Murray

Lynnette Murray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, JAMES F.

Attorney at ROTHMAN EVANS, P.C.

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, J.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less