This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/01/2020 at 16:44:17 (UTC).

Community Bank, N.A. v. Elijah N Roman

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Community Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Elijah N Roman. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0999

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMUNITY BANK N A

Defendant

Elijah N Roman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW, AMANDA C

Attorney at Riehlman, Shafer & Shaw, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #2)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing of a Copy of the Summons

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing of a Copy of the Summons; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Fees Listing

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Fees Listing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Military Search

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Military Search; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Filed Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Filed Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Filed Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Filed Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Contract; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Electronic Filing

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing of a Copy of the Summons; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Fees Listing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Military Search; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Filed Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Filed Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Contract; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit In Support of Claims Attorney Fees; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Mailing A Copy of the Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less