This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/21/2023 at 17:24:36 (UTC).

Community Bank, N.A. v. Cynthia M Scholeno

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Community Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cynthia M Scholeno. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1134

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Community Bank, N.A.

Defendant

Cynthia M Scholeno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW, AMANDA C

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/23/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/23/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Electronic Filing

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 11/28/2022; Received: 11/28/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/03/2023; Received: 01/03/2023

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/03/2023; Received: 01/03/2023

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)

ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2023; Received: 01/09/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2023; Received: 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/03/2023; Received: 01/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Bailey, B.; Filed: 01/03/2023; Received: 01/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 11/28/2022; Received: 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shaw, A. - filed by Riehlman Shafer and Shaw, LLC; Filed: 11/23/2022; Received: 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less