This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 23:10:45 (UTC).

COMMISSIONERS OF THE STATE INSURANCE FUND - v. - WPL CONSTRUCTION INC.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 COMMISSIONERS OF THE STATE INSURANCE FUND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WPL CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMISSIONERS OF THE STATE INSURANCE FUND

Defendant

WPL CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, JEREMY B.

Attorney at NEW YORK STATE INSURANCE FUND

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 03/01/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Service of Notice of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Service of Notice of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint

PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE - EFM-1 - Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Mandatory Electronic Filing

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE - EFM-1 - Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 03/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Service of Notice of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE - EFM-1 - Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Davis, J.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less