This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 22:26:48 (UTC).

Commissioners Of State Insurance Fund - v. - White Oak Builders Corp

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 Commissioners Of State Insurance Fund filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against White Oak Builders Corp. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commissioners Of State Insurance Fund

Defendant

White Oak Builders Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAIDENBAUM, JEFFREY A

Attorney at MAIDENBAUM & ASSOCIATES P.L.L.C.

Defendant Attorney

MEILAK, KRISTEN ANNA

Attorney at BARON & BARON, ESQS., P.C.

 

Court Documents

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Meilak, K.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Meilak, K.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less