Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:57:51 (UTC).

COLUMBIA DOLSON, LLC - v. - TOWN OF COLONIE ASSESSOR et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 COLUMBIA DOLSON, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against TOWN OF COLONIE ASSESSOR. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLUMBIA DOLSON, LLC

Defendants

TOWN OF COLONIE BOARD OF ASSESSMENT REVIEW

TOWN OF COLONIE ASSESSOR

TOWN OF COLONIE

Not Yet Classified

North Colonie Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MC NAMARA, MARK RYAN

Attorney at BARCLAY DAMON, LLP

Defendant Attorney

ALMY, STEPHEN MARK

Attorney at The Vincelette Law Firm

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RYAN, WILLIAM FRANCIS

Attorney at TABNER RYAN & KENIRY

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order of Settlement

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order of Settlement; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Entered by clerk

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulation and Order of Settlement for Judges' signature

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulation and Order of Settlement for Judges' signature; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order of Settlement; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulation and Order of Settlement for Judges' signature; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Mc Namara, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less