This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:53:02 (UTC).

Columbia Bank - v. - Pelaggia Sklvounos

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 Columbia Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pelaggia Sklvounos. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Columbia Bank

Defendant

Pelaggia Sklvounos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GETLER, JANINE A.

Attorney at GETLER, GOMES & SUTTON PC

SAMPSON, EVAN MAXWELL

Attorney at Dimensional Dental Management, LLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIEN

NOTICE OF LIEN; Filed By: Sampson, E.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Sampson, E.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT Income Information Subpoena

INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT Income Information Subpoena; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

EXECUTION Income Execution

EXECUTION Income Execution; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT (Motion #001)

DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B subpoena

EXHIBIT(S) - B subpoena; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Foreign Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A Foreign Judgment; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

JUDGMENT-FOREIGN (5402)

JUDGMENT-FOREIGN (5402); Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIEN; Filed By: Sampson, E.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Sampson, E.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT Income Information Subpoena; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXECUTION Income Execution; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B subpoena; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Foreign Judgment; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT-FOREIGN (5402); Filed By: Getler, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less