Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:54:52 (UTC).

Colonie Center - v. - Colonie, Town of

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Colonie Center filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Colonie, Town of. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colonie Center

Defendant

Colonie, Town of

Not Yet Classified

South Colonie Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILKES, DAVID

Attorney at Herman Katz Cangemi Wilkes & Clyne, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ALMY, STEPHEN MARK

Attorney at The Vincelette Law Firm

VINCELETTE, DANIEL GERARD

Attorney at THE VINCELETTE LAW FIRM

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RYAN, WILLIAM FRANCIS

Attorney at TABNER RYAN & KENIRY

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

APPRAISAL REPORT Addenda

APPRAISAL REPORT Addenda; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

APPRAISAL REPORT Appraisal Report

APPRAISAL REPORT Appraisal Report; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

NOTICE TO ADMIT Response to Notice to Admit Ratio

NOTICE TO ADMIT Response to Notice to Admit Ratio; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

NOTICE TO ADMIT Response to Notice to Admit

NOTICE TO ADMIT Response to Notice to Admit; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Attorney Wilkes

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Attorney Wilkes; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

NOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit Ratio

NOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit Ratio; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

NOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit Truth of Facts

NOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit Truth of Facts; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

APPRAISAL REPORT

APPRAISAL REPORT; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 10/11/2018; Received: 10/11/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

PETITION Notice of Petition and Petition

PETITION Notice of Petition and Petition; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPRAISAL REPORT Addenda; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPRAISAL REPORT Appraisal Report; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT Response to Notice to Admit Ratio; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT Response to Notice to Admit; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Attorney Wilkes; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit Ratio; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit Truth of Facts; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPRAISAL REPORT; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 10/11/2018; Received: 10/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Ryan, W.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Notice of Petition and Petition; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less