Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:42:24 (UTC).

Cohoes Falls Limited Partnership - v. - City of Cohoes et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Cohoes Falls Limited Partnership filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against City of Cohoes. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cohoes Falls Limited Partnership

Defendants

Assessor of the City of Cohoes

City of Cohoes

Board of Assessment Review

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDMAN, PAUL J

Attorney at Goldman Attorneys PLLC

Defendant Attorney

ALMY, STEPHEN MARK

Attorney at The Vincelette Law Firm

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Complaints

EXHIBIT(S) - B Complaints; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Property Description

EXHIBIT(S) - A Property Description; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Complaints; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Property Description; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less