This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 14:05:26 (UTC).

Cobble Hill Health Center - v. - Stephen Coward

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 Cobble Hill Health Center filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stephen Coward. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cobble Hill Health Center

Defendant

Stephen Coward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GANG, JASON ADAM

Attorney at Law Office of Jason Gang

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

AFFIRMATION non-military status affirmation

AFFIRMATION non-military status affirmation; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Whiteback

EXHIBIT(S) - A Whiteback; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's affidavit of default

AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's affidavit of default; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIRMATION affirmation of mailing of the summons and notice

AFFIRMATION affirmation of mailing of the summons and notice; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIRMATION aff mail judgment

AFFIRMATION aff mail judgment; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D POA Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C PIMM Budget Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION non-military status affirmation; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Invoice Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Whiteback; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's affidavit of default; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION affirmation of mailing of the summons and notice; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION aff mail judgment; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Gang, J.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less