This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 06:03:57 (UTC).

CMS Complete Management, Inc. - v. - Classic Heating and Cooling Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 CMS Complete Management, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Classic Heating and Cooling Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence Knipel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Lawrence Knipel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMS Complete Management, Inc.

Defendant

Classic Heating and Cooling Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLUS, PAUL FELIX

Attorney at Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Judgment with Notice of Entry/Copy of Entered Judgment/Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Judgment with Notice of Entry/Copy of Entered Judgment/Proof of Service; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Copy of Entered Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Copy of Entered Order; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Request for Judicial Intervention

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)(4) with Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)(4) with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint and Notice Regarding Availability of Electron ... show more

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint and Notice Regarding Availability of Electron ... show more; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice Regarding Availability of Electronic ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice Regarding Availability of Electronic ... show more; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement dated November 30, 2016

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement dated November 30, 2016; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Judgment with Notice of Entry/Copy of Entered Judgment/Proof of Service; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Copy of Entered Order; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)(4) with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint and Notice Regarding Availability of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons, Verified Complaint, and Notice Regarding Availability of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement dated November 30, 2016; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Millus, P.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less