Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 22:58:27 (UTC).

CLEORETTA GREEN - v. - PLAYTOGS OUTPARCELS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 CLEORETTA GREEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PLAYTOGS OUTPARCELS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cleoretta Green

Defendants

ONYX MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC

CSMC 2007-C1 DOLSON AVE. ASSOC., LLC.

PLAYTOGS OUTPARCELS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMBARERI, MARK P

Attorney at Mark P. Cambareri

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

Defendant Attorneys

CASSELS, STEPHEN JOHN

Attorney at Varvaro, Cotter & Bender

NEUGEBAUER, PAUL L.

Attorney at Law Office of Robert F. Horvat

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Neugebauer, P.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Neugebauer, P.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, Copy of Decision, and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, Copy of Decision, and Proof of Service; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) affidavit of service-reply affirmation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) affidavit of service-reply affirmation; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

DEMAND FOR: Notice to Preserve to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: Notice to Preserve to Plaintiff; Filed By: Hughes, P.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Dmd for BP to Pltf and Various Other Dmds to Ptys by Defts

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Dmd for BP to Pltf and Various Other Dmds to Ptys by Defts; Filed By: Hughes, P.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross Claims by Defts Playtogs and Wharton Realty

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross Claims by Defts Playtogs and Wharton Realty; Filed By: Hughes, P.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Neugebauer, P.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Neugebauer, P.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, Copy of Decision, and Proof of Service; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) affidavit of service-reply affirmation; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Cassels, S.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Salvi, D.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice to Preserve to Plaintiff; Filed By: Hughes, P.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Dmd for BP to Pltf and Various Other Dmds to Ptys by Defts; Filed By: Hughes, P.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross Claims by Defts Playtogs and Wharton Realty; Filed By: Hughes, P.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less