This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 18:41:47 (UTC).

Cleaver Brooks, Inc., v. Leon D. Dematteis Construction Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Cleaver Brooks, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Leon D Dematteis Construction Corporation. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cleaver Brooks, Inc.,

Defendants

ABC Companies 1-100 (fictitious entities)

John Does 1-100 (Fictitious persons)

Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of Americas and Federal Insurance Company

Leon D. Dematteis Construction Corporation

Scott Dematteis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HATEM, ALBERT A

Attorney at ALBERT A. HATEM, PC

Defendant Attorney

KUZOW, MICHAEL FRANCIS

Attorney at Westermann Sheehy Keenan Samaan & Aydelott, LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER (AMENDED) Verified Amended Answer

ANSWER (AMENDED) Verified Amended Answer; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service of Travelers

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service of Travelers; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service of Scott DeMatteis

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service of Scott DeMatteis; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service for Federal Insurance

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service for Federal Insurance; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306 Notice & Affidavit of Add'l Service for Demateis Connstruction

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306 Notice & Affidavit of Add'l Service for Demateis Connstruction; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Unpaid Invoices

EXHIBIT(S) - C Unpaid Invoices; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Payment Bond

EXHIBIT(S) - B Payment Bond; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lien

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lien; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Verified Amended Answer; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kuzow, M.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service of Travelers; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service of Scott DeMatteis; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service for Federal Insurance; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hatem, A. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306 Notice & Affidavit of Add'l Service for Demateis Connstruction; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Unpaid Invoices; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Payment Bond; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Lien; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Hatem, A.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less