This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 21:01:09 (UTC).

City of Syracuse - v. - Frederick Elderbroom

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 City of Syracuse filed an Other lawsuit against Frederick Elderbroom. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2316

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Syracuse

Defendant

Frederick Elderbroom

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN, KATHRYN MAUREEN

Attorney at City of Syracuse Office of the Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 10/11/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A invoice for demolition costs

EXHIBIT(S) - A invoice for demolition costs; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D 24-hour Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - D 24-hour Letter; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Record of Administrative Hearing

EXHIBIT(S) - C Record of Administrative Hearing; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B 15-day Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - B 15-day Letter; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Structural Report

EXHIBIT(S) - A Structural Report; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIDAVIT Inspector Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Inspector Affidavit; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 10/11/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A invoice for demolition costs; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D 24-hour Letter; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Record of Administrative Hearing; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B 15-day Letter; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Structural Report; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Inspector Affidavit; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Ryan, K. - filed by City of Syracuse Corporation Counsel Office; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less