This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 00:51:10 (UTC).

City of Jamestown v. Jamestown Professional Firefighters Assoc. Local 137 et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 City of Jamestown filed an Other lawsuit against Jamestown Professional Firefighters Assoc Local 137. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1055

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMESTOWN CITY OF

Defendants

Gerald W Ingerson JR

JAMESTOWN PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSON, PETER GORDON

Attorney at Bly, Sheffield, Bargar, and Pillittieri

Defendant Attorney

DE ANGELO, CHARLES SALVATORE

Attorney at FESSENDEN LAUMER AND DEANGELO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Order & Judgment and Transcript

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Order & Judgment and Transcript; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry with Order & Judgment and Transcript

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry with Order & Judgment and Transcript; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2)

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Amended Proposed Order with Attached Transcript

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Amended Proposed Order with Attached Transcript; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) NYSCEF Document List

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) NYSCEF Document List; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G CBA

EXHIBIT(S) - G CBA; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Arbitration Demand

EXHIBIT(S) - F Arbitration Demand; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - E correspondence; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Grievance denial

EXHIBIT(S) - D Grievance denial; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Grievance

EXHIBIT(S) - C Grievance; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B NYS Disabililty approval

EXHIBIT(S) - B NYS Disabililty approval; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A NYS Disability

EXHIBIT(S) - A NYS Disability; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOM with PGL Affirmation

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOM with PGL Affirmation; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Order & Judgment and Transcript; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry with Order & Judgment and Transcript; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Amended Proposed Order with Attached Transcript; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Memorandum of Law; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) NYSCEF Document List; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Certified Mail Return Receipt; Filed By: De Angelo, C.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G CBA; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Arbitration Demand; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E correspondence; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Grievance denial; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Grievance; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B NYS Disabililty approval; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NYS Disability; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOM with PGL Affirmation; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Larson, P.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less