This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 02:39:32 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE, INC. v. ROBERT A. RIZZO et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 CITIMORTGAGE, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROBERT A RIZZO. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1285

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIMORTGAGE INC

Defendants

Lori A Rizzo

Robert A Rizzo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, HEATHER C

Attorney at DAVIDSON, FINK, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

ORDER - FINAL

ORDER - FINAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #1)

ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notice 12-18-19. Mailed 11-14-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notice 12-18-19. Mailed 11-14-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 12-18-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 12-18-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE lori

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE lori; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FINAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notice 12-18-19. Mailed 11-14-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 12-18-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT RIZZO; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE lori; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less