Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 12:37:47 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE, INC. v. MILA JOURAVLEVA et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 CITIMORTGAGE, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MILA JOURAVLEVA. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIMORTGAGE, INC.

Defendants

John Doe #1 through John Doe #12

Mila Jouravleva

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF TRUMP PARC CONDOMINIUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MULLANE, MADELINE CAROL

Attorney at ROACH & LIN, P.C.

BRENNAN, JENNIFER R.

Attorney at Roach & Lin, P.C.

Roach, Peter

Attorney at Peter T. Roach & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - MILA JOURAVLEVA

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - MILA JOURAVLEVA; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MILA JOURAVLEVA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MILA JOURAVLEVA; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 11/30/2019; Received: 11/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF TRUMP PARC CONDOMINIUM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF TRUMP PARC CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 11/30/2019; Received: 11/30/2019

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - MILA JOURAVLEVA; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MILA JOURAVLEVA; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 11/30/2019; Received: 11/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF TRUMP PARC CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by INDEPENDENT PROCESS, INC.; Filed: 11/30/2019; Received: 11/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mullane, M.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less