This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:52:39 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE, INC., ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, v. PEI YI LI et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 CITIMORTGAGE, INC , ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PEI YI LI. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIMORTGAGE, INC., ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS,

Defendants

Pei Yi Li

Sze Man Lee

KINGS COUNTY CLERK

Janet Lee

John Does

Jane Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LISS, GREGORY STEVEN

Attorney at Houser LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Jane Does---Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Jane Does---Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIDAVIT John Does --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT John Does --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIDAVIT Janet Lee - Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Janet Lee - Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIDAVIT Kings County Clerk - Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Kings County Clerk - Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIDAVIT Sze Man Lee --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Sze Man Lee --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIDAVIT Pei Yi Li --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Pei Yi Li --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - K Erroneous Satisfaction Jan 24, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K Erroneous Satisfaction Jan 24, 2020; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - J 1.8.2020 CEMA MERS ServicerID

EXHIBIT(S) - J 1.8.2020 CEMA MERS ServicerID; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - I Consolidation Extension and Modification Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - I Consolidation Extension and Modification Agreement; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - H Gap Mortgage 1.8.2020_Summit

EXHIBIT(S) - H Gap Mortgage 1.8.2020_Summit; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - G Note

EXHIBIT(S) - G Note; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - F AOM PennyMac to MERS Nom Summit

EXHIBIT(S) - F AOM PennyMac to MERS Nom Summit; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment of Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment of Mortgage; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D Assignment of Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - D Assignment of Mortgage; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Mortgage 5.27.2014_Summit Mortgage Bankers

EXHIBIT(S) - C Mortgage 5.27.2014_Summit Mortgage Bankers; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Original Note - 2014- B

EXHIBIT(S) - B Original Note - 2014- B; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A Description

EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A Description; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Jane Does---Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT John Does --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Janet Lee - Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Kings County Clerk - Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Sze Man Lee --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Pei Yi Li --- Affidavit of Service & Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K Erroneous Satisfaction Jan 24, 2020; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J 1.8.2020 CEMA MERS ServicerID; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I Consolidation Extension and Modification Agreement; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H Gap Mortgage 1.8.2020_Summit; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Note; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F AOM PennyMac to MERS Nom Summit; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment of Mortgage; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Assignment of Mortgage; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Mortgage 5.27.2014_Summit Mortgage Bankers; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Original Note - 2014- B; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A Description; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Liss, G.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less