This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 00:30:13 (UTC).

Citibank, N.A. v. Roger J Levitt et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Citibank, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Roger J Levitt. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

Defendants

Ariel Ostad

Board of Managers of Channel Club Condominium

Alaleh Ostad

Roger J Levitt

Washington Mutual Bank FA successor by merger to Home Savings of America, FSB

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #10, the last ten names being fictitious and unknown to the plaintiff, the person or parties intended being the persons or parties, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Mortgaged premises described i

New York City Parking Violations

Homecomings Financial Network, Inc

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as mortgagee, as nominee for TD Bank, N.A., its successors and assigns

New York City Environmental Control Board

New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau

Neuroaxis Neurosurgical Associates P C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALASCO, TODD C

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON

Defendant Attorney

COHEN, HERBERT LEONARD

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/ ALALEH OSTAD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/ ALALEH OSTAD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ ALALEH OSTAD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ ALALEH OSTAD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE CHANNEL CLUB CONDOMINIUM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE CHANNEL CLUB CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ALALEH OSTAD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ALALEH OSTAD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ARIEL OSTAD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ARIEL OSTAD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ROGER J. LEVITT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ROGER J. LEVITT; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOME SAVINGS OF AMERICA, FSB

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOME SAVINGS OF AMERICA, FSB; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AS MORTGAGEE, AS NOMINEE FOR ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AS MORTGAGEE, AS NOMINEE FOR ... show more; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/ ALALEH OSTAD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ ALALEH OSTAD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2020; Received: 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE CHANNEL CLUB CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ALALEH OSTAD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ARIEL OSTAD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ROGER J. LEVITT; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, CLAIM TO AND DEMAND FOR SURPLUS MONIES AND NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT; Filed By: Cohen, H.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEUROAXIS NEUROSURGICAL ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOME SAVINGS OF AMERICA, FSB; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AS MORTGAGEE, AS NOMINEE FOR TD BANK, N.A., ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNSSERVICE; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less