This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 07/21/2023 at 17:35:39 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. v. ROBERT N KELLY

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT N KELLY. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

Robert N Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1311759

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1311759; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/24/2020; Received: 07/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E; Filed: 09/10/2020; Received: 09/10/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E; Filed: 09/10/2020; Received: 09/10/2020

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2020; Received: 09/16/2020

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE R&R FILE# 1311759

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE R&R FILE# 1311759; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/28/2021; Received: 05/28/2021

 

Docket Entries

05/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE R&R FILE# 1311759; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 05/28/2021; Received: 05/28/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2020
View Court Documents

Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2020; Received: 09/16/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E; Filed: 09/10/2020; Received: 09/10/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E; Filed: 09/10/2020; Received: 09/10/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1311759; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/24/2020; Received: 07/24/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less