This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 03/20/2023 at 23:35:45 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. v. MICHAEL EHRENKRANZ

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL EHRENKRANZ. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Michael Ehrenkranz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Defendant Attorney

BAGGAN, KRISTI-ANN KYNA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by J&E; Filed: 10/04/2022; Received: 10/04/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by J&E; Filed: 10/04/2022; Received: 10/04/2022

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Baggan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2022; Received: 10/05/2022

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2022; Received: 10/11/2022

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/21/2022; Received: 11/21/2022

 

Docket Entries

11/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/21/2022; Received: 11/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2022; Received: 10/11/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Baggan, K.; Filed: 10/05/2022; Received: 10/05/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by J&E; Filed: 10/04/2022; Received: 10/04/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by J&E; Filed: 10/04/2022; Received: 10/04/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less