This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 16:50:05 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. v. BEVERLY CLARK

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BEVERLY CLARK. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Beverly Clark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/15/2020; Received: 12/15/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Marshal Joseph A. Polizzi; Filed: 09/18/2020; Received: 09/18/2020

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Marshal Joseph A. Polizzi; Filed: 09/18/2020; Received: 09/18/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/01/2020; Received: 09/01/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/15/2020; Received: 12/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Marshal Joseph A. Polizzi; Filed: 09/18/2020; Received: 09/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Marshal Joseph A. Polizzi; Filed: 09/18/2020; Received: 09/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/01/2020; Received: 09/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less