Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 12:49:39 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. v. BALMORE E QUIJANO

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BALMORE E QUIJANO. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Balmore E Quijano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

RUGGIERO, DANIEL GOLDSMITH

Attorney at Law Offices of Daniel G. Ruggiero

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) 1301637

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) 1301637; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) 1301637 RJI

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) 1301637 RJI; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) 1301637 PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) 1301637 PROPOSED ORDER; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - RJI; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MOTION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MOTION; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT E - ANSWER

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT E - ANSWER; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT D - SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT D - SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT C - CERTIFICATE

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT C - CERTIFICATE; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT B - CARD AGREEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT B - CARD AGREEMENT; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT A - BILLING STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT A - BILLING STATEMENTS; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) 1301637 NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) 1301637 NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Ruggiero, D.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) 1301637; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) 1301637 RJI; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) 1301637 PROPOSED ORDER; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - RJI; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MOTION; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT E - ANSWER; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT D - SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT C - CERTIFICATE; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT B - CARD AGREEMENT; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) 1301637 EXHIBIT A - BILLING STATEMENTS; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) 1301637 AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) 1301637 NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Ruggiero, D.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by J&E Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1301637; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less