This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:42:04 (UTC).

CIT BANK, N.A. - v. - WILLIAM E. LATHAN et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 CIT BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WILLIAM E LATHAN. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIT BANK, N.A.

Defendants

William E. Lathan

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

John Doe 1-JOHN DOE 12 THE LAST TWELVE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS AND UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF,THE PERSONS OR PARTIES INTENDED BEING THE TENANTS, OCCUPANTS, PERSONS OR CORPS, IF ANY, HAVING OR CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN OR LIEN UPON THE PREMISES, DESCRIBED IN T

Melvina Lathan

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

CLAIR, IRA S

Attorney at Clair & Gjertsen, Esqs.

AUFRECHT, MARY KATHRYN

Attorney at Clair & Gjertsen, Esqs

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

ORDER - OTHER 90 Day Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3216 - Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure

ORDER - OTHER 90 Day Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3216 - Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

ORDER - REFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure

ORDER - REFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MELVINA LATHAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MELVINA LATHAN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-WILLIAM E. LATHAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-WILLIAM E. LATHAN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ BANK OF AMERICA N.A.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER 90 Day Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3216 - Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE Mandatory Appearance Part - Foreclosure; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THERESA LATHAN AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MELVINA LATHAN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-WILLIAM E. LATHAN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ BANK OF AMERICA N.A.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Koester, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less