This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 00:54:35 (UTC).

CILICI, LLC v. JASON E STURSA et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 CILICI, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JASON E STURSA. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Fcp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1060

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Fcp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CILICI LLC

Defendants

Jason E Stursa A/K/A JASON STURSA

PALISADES COLLECTION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VARTOLO, RALPH LAWRENCE

Attorney at FRIEDMAN VARTOLO LLP

THIBAUT, JULIANA

Attorney at Friedman Vartolo LLP

Defendant Attorney

DEMARCO, JOSEPH EDWARD

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter D. Grubea

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Discontinuing Action and Canceling Lis Pendens

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Discontinuing Action and Canceling Lis Pendens; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Settlement Conference Compliance

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Settlement Conference Compliance; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Discontinue

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Discontinue; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Demarco, J.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner's notice 9-18-19, mailed 8-28-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner's notice 9-18-19, mailed 8-28-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 9-18-19

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 9-18-19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing- Request for Judicial Intervention

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing- Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Notices of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F Notices of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Proof of Filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Proof of Filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D 90 Day Notices Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D 90 Day Notices Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing NOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Discontinuing Action and Canceling Lis Pendens; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Settlement Conference Compliance; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Discontinue; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Demarco, J.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner's notice 9-18-19, mailed 8-28-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 9-18-19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing- Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING Consent to E-filing; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Notices of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Proof of Filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D 90 Day Notices Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Thibaut, J.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less