This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 03/01/2020 at 13:55:03 (UTC).

Christy L Armenta v. Aaron M Preston et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 Christy L Armenta filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Aaron M Preston. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********50CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christy L Armenta

Defendants

Aaron M Preston

Brett R Santacroce

Roger L Santacroce

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINS, ADAM STEPHAN

Attorney at CAMPBELL & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorneys

GRAFF, KEVIN JAY

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

BIZUB, SCOTT JAMES

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L HARTFORD

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2)

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Enclosing Proposed Order

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Enclosing Proposed Order; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Decision and Order of Justice William Taylor

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Decision and Order of Justice William Taylor; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Image from Google Maps

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Image from Google Maps; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non-Service on Brett Santacroce

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non-Service on Brett Santacroce; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service for Aaron Preston

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service for Aaron Preston; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Accident Report

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Accident Report; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Enclosing Proposed Order; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Decision and Order of Justice William Taylor; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Image from Google Maps; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Second Affidavit of Kirk Fedor; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non-Service on Roger Santacroce; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non-Service on Brett Santacroce; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service for Aaron Preston; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Accident Report; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hains, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less