This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 10:07:27 (UTC).

CHRISTY HAHN et al - v. - KEVIN FRANCIS OHARE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 CHRISTY HAHN filed an Other lawsuit against KEVIN FRANCIS OHARE. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christy Hahn

Mi young Hahn MOTHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF KEE WON HAHN

Mi young Hahn

Defendant

Kevin francis Ohare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK, INHO A.

Attorney at ANDREW PARK, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

FARMER, STEVEN T J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DENIS J. KENNEDY

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

--none--

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

--none--

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

Response to Demand for Medical Reports

DEMAND FOR:

Post EBT Demand for Discovery

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

Response to Demand for Exchange of Medical Reports

DEMAND FOR:

Post EBT Demand for Discovery

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

Response to Demand for Exchange of Medical Reports

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

Response to Exchange of Medical Reports

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

Letter to Court confirming June 7 Conf & Dep adj to July 10, 2018

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Park, I.; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Medical Reports; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand for Discovery; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Exchange of Medical Reports; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand for Discovery; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 07/18/2018; Received: 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Exchange of Medical Reports; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Exchange of Medical Reports; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court confirming June 7 Conf & Dep adj to July 10, 2018; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand as to plaintiff Kee Won Hahn; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Park, I.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Park, I.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Farmer, S.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Park, I. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Park, I. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Park, I. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Park, I. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Park, I.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less