This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/24/2020 at 18:32:43 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER PERRY - v. - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 CHRISTOPHER PERRY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Perry

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGMAN, MICHAEL E

Defendant Attorneys

ROSEN, ADAM BRIAN

HERMAN, IAN MARC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and complaint; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Demand for change of venue

EXHIBIT(S) - B Demand for change of venue; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - C Answer; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

CONSENT TO EFILING Notice Regarding Availability of Electronic Filing Supreme Court Cases

CONSENT TO EFILING Notice Regarding Availability of Electronic Filing Supreme Court Cases; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) Fully executed Stip adj. Defendants' Motion to Change Venue from 8-21 to 9-27-17

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) Fully executed Stip adj. Defendants' Motion to Change Venue from 8-21 to 9-27-17; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosen, A.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosen, A.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) Fully executed Stip adj. Defendants' Motion to Change Venue from 8-21 to 9-27-17; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING Notice Regarding Availability of Electronic Filing Supreme Court Cases; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Answer; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Demand for change of venue; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and complaint; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Herman, I.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less