Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 12:18:12 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER J. KEILITZ - v. - LIGHT TOWER FIBER NEW YORK, INC et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2017 CHRISTOPHER J KEILITZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LIGHT TOWER FIBER NEW YORK, INC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher J. Keilitz

Defendants and Petitioners

LIGHT TOWER FIBER NEW YORK, INC

EMPIRE CITY SUBWAY

VERIZON NEW YORK, INC.

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Respondent

HELLMAN ELECTRIC CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NAPOLI, MARIE

Attorney at NAPOLI SHKOLNIK PLLC

NAPOLI, JOSEPH P.

Attorney at NAPOLI SHKOLNIK, PLLC

Petitioner Attorney

FRANCESCA A. SABBATINO DAVID H SCHULTZ

Defendant Attorneys

SCHULTZ, DAVID H

Attorney at Barry McTiernan & Moore

SABBATINO, FRANCESCA A.

Attorney at FRANCESCA A. SABBATINO

VILLEGAS, BRIDGETTE

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

REIMER, ALEXANDRA JOIE

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

PRISCO, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at MCANDREW CONBOY & PRISCO, LLP

Respondent Attorney

VINCENT S AMBROSINO

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM

--none--

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

Notice of Appearance

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

Consent to Change Attorney

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

140 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Filed By: Ambrosino, V.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Villegas, B.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Villegas, B.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: Reimer, A.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Napoli, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Napoli, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Napoli, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Napoli, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Napoli, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Prisco, M.; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Napoli, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Napoli, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Napoli, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Napoli, J.; Filed: 09/23/2017; Received: 09/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less