This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 02/19/2023 at 14:57:53 (UTC).

Christopher D. Parker v. Plateau Enterprises, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Christopher D Parker filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Plateau Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********3125

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher D. Parker

Defendant

Plateau Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUATTROCCI, ROBERT ALAN

Defendant Attorney

ADAMS, DAVID R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 11/14/2022; Received: 11/14/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 12/06/2022; Received: 12/06/2022

AFFIDAVIT subpoena Raynor Overhead Door

AFFIDAVIT subpoena Raynor Overhead Door; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 01/27/2023; Received: 01/27/2023

ANSWER Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Discovery to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Discovery to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Discovery and Inspection

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* to Produce Tax & Wages Information to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* to Produce Tax & Wages Information to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* to Produce Policy/ies & Contracts to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* to Produce Policy/ies & Contracts to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

INTERROGATORIES First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff

INTERROGATORIES First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Specific Relief Demand to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Specific Relief Demand to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

DEMAND FOR: Medicare, Medicaid, SSDI Information to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: Medicare, Medicaid, SSDI Information to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

DEMAND FOR: Prior Pleadings & Things to Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: Prior Pleadings & Things to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Video/Audiotaped Examination Before Trial of Plaintiff

DEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Video/Audiotaped Examination Before Trial of Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Video/Audiotaped Examination Before Trial of Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: Prior Pleadings & Things to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: Medicare, Medicaid, SSDI Information to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Specific Relief Demand to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketINTERROGATORIES First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: *Notice* to Produce Policy/ies & Contracts to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: *Notice* to Produce Tax & Wages Information to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: *Notice* for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: Omnibus Discovery to Plaintiff; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT subpoena Raynor Overhead Door; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 01/27/2023; Received: 01/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 12/06/2022; Received: 12/06/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 11/14/2022; Received: 11/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less