Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 00:16:18 (UTC).

Christian Lannon - v. - Stockmohr Co. Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 Christian Lannon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Stockmohr Co Inc. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Lannon

Defendants and Petitioners

Stockmohr Co. Inc.

Thomas Hurley

Respondent

Peter C Smouse d/b/a Smouse Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODEAS, HARRY GEORGE

Attorney at LOSI & GANGI

Petitioner Attorney

DAVID R ADAMS

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS, DAVID R

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine, P.C.

CURVIN, STEVEN P.

Attorney at BURGIO, CURVIN & BANKER

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

--none--

PROOF OF SERVICE

proof of service of order and judgment on Peter Smouse

NOTICE OF ENTRY

notice of entry of order and judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service - Motion for Default Judgment

EXHIBIT(S)

Written Agreement

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer (Stockmohr)

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer (Hurley)

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

Third-Party Summons and Complaint

ANSWER

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

COMPLAINT

--none--

SUMMONS

--none--

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE proof of service of order and judgment on Peter Smouse; Filed By: Curvin, S.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY notice of entry of order and judgment; Filed By: Curvin, S.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service - Motion for Default Judgment; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #002) insurance policies of Smouse; Filed By: Curvin, S.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Third Party Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Written Agreement; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Answer (Stockmohr); Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Answer (Hurley); Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third-Party Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Adams, D.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Curvin, S.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Modeas, H.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Modeas, H.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less