This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/25/2020 at 02:38:07 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ - v. - 122 EAST 42ND STREET, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 122 EAST 42ND STREET, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Hernandez

Defendants

122 EAST 42ND STREET, LLC

C.B. LAND ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIONDI, LAWRENCE P.

ROMAN, JULIO CESAR

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS, CRUZ M

KALMAN, BRIAN ADAM

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - HON. ROBERT D. KALISH

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - HON. ROBERT D. KALISH; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/23/2018; Received: 11/23/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 08/23/2018; Received: 08/23/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Kalman, B.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Kalman, B.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Due Diligence - C.B. Land Associates

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Due Diligence - C.B. Land Associates; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 122 East 42nd Street LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 122 East 42nd Street LLC; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - HON. ROBERT D. KALISH; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/23/2018; Received: 11/23/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 08/23/2018; Received: 08/23/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/22/2018; Received: 08/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Roman, J.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Kalman, B.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kalman, B.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Due Diligence - C.B. Land Associates; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 122 East 42nd Street LLC; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Biondi, L.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less