Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:48:27 (UTC).

CHESWOLD (TL), LLC - v. - The heirs-at-law, next of kin, distributees, executors, administrators, assignees, lienors, creditors, successors-in-interest and generally all persons having or claiming under, by or through GEORGE A. THOMAS A/K/A GEORGE AD

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 CHESWOLD TL , LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against The heirs-at-law, next of kin, distributees, executors, administrators, assignees, lienors, creditors, successors-in-interest and generally all persons having or claiming under, by or through GEORGE A THOMAS A/K/A GEORGE AD. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1745

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHESWOLD (TL), LLC

Defendants

COUNTY OF MONROE

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

CACH, LLC A/P/O CHASE MANHATTAN BANK

Alberta Thomas INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE A. THOMAS A/K/A GEORGE ADAM THOMAS, DECEASED

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #100

Jeffrey S. Thomas

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

all of whose names and addresses are unknown to Plaintiff

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES, L.L.C.

CITY COURT OF ROCHESTER

NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION LLC

UNITED STATE OF AMERICA

The heirs-at-law, next of kin, distributees, executors, administrators, assignees, lienors, creditors, successors-in-interest and generally all persons having or claiming under, by or through GEORGE A. THOMAS A/K/A GEORGE ADAM THOMAS, by purchase, in

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L.L.C.

Not Yet Classified

All New York Process Servers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

IACCHETTA, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

CERRONE, MICHAEL SALVATORE

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER Vacates Judgment of foreclosure and discontinues action

ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER Vacates Judgment of foreclosure and discontinues action; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D REFEREE'S CONSENT

EXHIBIT(S) - D REFEREE'S CONSENT; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

EXHIBIT(S) - C JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER Vacates Judgment of foreclosure and discontinues action; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D REFEREE'S CONSENT; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less