Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:48:55 (UTC).

CHESWOLD (TL), LLC - v. - D'SHAWNA DUPREE et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 CHESWOLD TL , LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against D'SHAWNA DUPREE. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1742

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHESWOLD (TL), LLC

Defendants

Sean Doe

US BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC

COUNTY OF MONROE

D'shawna Dupree A/K/A D'SHAWNA D. DUPREE-WILSON

HOME SOLUTIONS PARTNERS III, LP

PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #100

Not Yet Classified

All New York Process Servers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

CRAIN, MICHELE R.

Attorney at MONROE COUNTY Law Department

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of Entry of order granting permission to reschedule the foreclosure sale with Affidavit of Se ... show more

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of Entry of order granting permission to reschedule the foreclosure sale with Affidavit of Se ... show more; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) EXTENDS TIME FOR FORECLOSURE SALE

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) EXTENDS TIME FOR FORECLOSURE SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service by Mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #4) Correspondence

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #4) Correspondence; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Affirmation; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) Order Granting Permission to Reschedule the Foreclosure Sale

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) Order Granting Permission to Reschedule the Foreclosure Sale; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of Entry of order granting permission to reschedule the foreclosure sale with Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) EXTENDS TIME FOR FORECLOSURE SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #4) Correspondence; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Affirmation; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) Order Granting Permission to Reschedule the Foreclosure Sale; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of Entry of Order Granting Permission to Reschedule the Foreclosure Sale with Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less