Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 20:42:47 (UTC).

CHESWOLD (TL), LLC - v. - CATHY KNIGHTON et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 CHESWOLD TL , LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CATHY KNIGHTON. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1807

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHESWOLD (TL), LLC

Defendants

Cathy Knighton INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR C.T.A OF THE ESTATE OF HENRY F. BRINSON, DECEASED

US BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC

COUNTY OF MONROE

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Curtis E. Brinson

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #100

PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

Not Yet Classified

All New York Process Servers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

RULISON, MALLORIE CLAIRE

Attorney at HONORABLE KEVIN M. NASCA

CRAIN, MICHELE R.

Attorney at MONROE COUNTY Law Department

Not Yet Classified Attorney

IACCHETTA, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 09/10/2017; Received: 09/10/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Crain, M.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iacchetta, A. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rulison, M.; Filed: 09/10/2017; Received: 09/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less