Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 06:16:35 (UTC).

CHESWOLD (TL), LLC - v. - ALEKSANDR PODZOROV et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 CHESWOLD TL , LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ALEKSANDR PODZOROV. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1951

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHESWOLD (TL), LLC

Defendants

DISCOVER BANK

COUNTY OF MONROE

US BANK AS CUSTODIAN FOR PFS FINANCIAL 1, LLC

Dan Klee

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

PROPEL FINANCIAL 1, LLC

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #100

Judy Klee

BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Aleksandr Podzorov A/K/A ALEKSANDR PORZOROV

Not Yet Classified

All New York Process Servers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

IACCHETTA, ANTHONY J

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

Defendant Attorney

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

 

Court Documents

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Order of Reference to Compute

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Order of Reference to Compute; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1) Matthew Fero, Referee

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1) Matthew Fero, Referee; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/23/2018; Received: 02/23/2018

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail with FYI Letter

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail with FYI Letter; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibits for Affidavit of Merit

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibits for Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Order of Reference to Compute; Filed By: Iacchetta, A.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1) Matthew Fero, Referee; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/23/2018; Received: 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail with FYI Letter; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibits for Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less