Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 03:08:52 (UTC).

Chestnut Hills Homeowners Association v. 77 Chestnut Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Chestnut Hills Homeowners Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 77 Chestnut Corporation. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0131

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chestnut Hills Homeowners Association

Defendant

77 Chestnut Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITELAW, KENNETH D.

Attorney at WHITELAW & FANGIO

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT 308 Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT 308 Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Claim

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Claim; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT Aff of Service /Secretary of State

AFFIDAVIT Aff of Service /Secretary of State; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 308 Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Claim; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Aff of Service /Secretary of State; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Whitelaw, K.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less