This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 15:39:00 (UTC).

Cheryl L. Mackmer - v. - Jonathan C. Shaffer

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 Cheryl L Mackmer filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jonathan C Shaffer. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cheryl L. Mackmer

Defendant

Jonathan C. Shaffer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VONA, P ANDREW

Attorney at Muscato DiMillo & Vona LLP

Defendant Attorney

ARCHILLA, DANIEL RICHARD

Attorney at BUFFALO STAFF COUNSEL MANAGING ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

DEMAND FOR: NOTICE OF REVOCATION OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MEANS

DEMAND FOR: NOTICE OF REVOCATION OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MEANS; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

DEMAND FOR: NOTICE FOR INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

DEMAND FOR: NOTICE FOR INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR MEDICARE/MEDICAID LIEN INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR MEDICARE/MEDICAID LIEN INFORMATION; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

DEMAND FOR: OMNIBUS DISCOVERY DEMANDS

DEMAND FOR: OMNIBUS DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

ANSWER ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vona, P; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Vona, P; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: NOTICE OF REVOCATION OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MEANS; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: NOTICE FOR INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR MEDICARE/MEDICAID LIEN INFORMATION; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: OMNIBUS DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Filed By: Archilla, D.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vona, P; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Vona, P; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less