This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:36:49 (UTC).

CHARLOTTE FOREMAN - v. - PAUL FLUTA

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 CHARLOTTE FOREMAN filed an Other lawsuit against PAUL FLUTA. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlotte Foreman

Defendant

Paul Fluta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEWBOROUGH, BRUCE A.

Attorney at BRUCE NEWBOROUGH P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

FLANAGAN, JAMES ROBERT

Attorney at ABAMONT & ASSOCIATES

SALTZMAN, STEPHEN ALAN

Attorney at Law office of Robert F. Horvat

CARTON, THOMAS GERARD

Attorney at Abamont & Associates

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Order dated 9/6/18

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Order dated 9/6/18; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Saltzman, S. - filed by Abamont & associates; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/23/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/23/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Carton, T. - filed by FISHKIN & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Newborough, B. - filed by Richardson, B.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Order dated March 29, 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Order dated March 29, 2018; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Newborough, B.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Saltzman, S. - filed by Abamont & associates; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 11/1/18

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 11/1/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Newborough, B. - filed by Richardson, B.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Carton, T. - filed by FISHKIN & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Saltzman, S. - filed by Abamont & associates; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Newborough, B. - filed by Richardson, B.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Carton, T. - filed by FISHKIN & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Carton, T. - filed by FISHKIN & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 11/1/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Order dated 9/6/18; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Order dated March 29, 2018; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 9/6/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/23/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Newborough, B.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Saltzman, S. - filed by Abamont & associates; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Saltzman, S. - filed by Abamont & associates; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Saltzman, S. - filed by Abamont & associates; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Newborough, B. - filed by Richardson, B.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Newborough, B. - filed by Richardson, B.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Newborough, B. - filed by Richardson, B.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less