This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 12:27:43 (UTC).

CHARLIE WAXTER v. NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 CHARLIE WAXTER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlie Waxter

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

LINCOLN MEDICAL CENTER

NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSS, MATTHEW J

Attorney at PENA & KAHN, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

CAVALLARO, JACQUELINE

Attorney at NYC HEALTH & HOSPITALS CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/29/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/29/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Notice of Medical Malpractice Action

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Notice of Medical Malpractice Action; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Responses to initial discovery demands

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Responses to initial discovery demands; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support and Good Faith Affirmation

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support and Good Faith Affirmation; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION Notice Of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION Notice Of Motion; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

ANSWER HHC s/h/a HHC and Lincoln Medical Center answer

ANSWER HHC s/h/a HHC and Lincoln Medical Center answer; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Notice of Medical Malpractice Action; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Responses to initial discovery demands; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Verified Answer and Defendant's Initial Discovery Demands; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support and Good Faith Affirmation; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice Of Motion; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER HHC s/h/a HHC and Lincoln Medical Center answer; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ross, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ross, M.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less