This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:47:23 (UTC).

Charles Winhoffer - v. - 125 Wythe Inc., d/b/a Fat Goose et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Charles Winhoffer filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 125 Wythe Inc , d/b/a Fat Goose. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Winhoffer

Defendants

125 Wythe Inc., d/b/a Fat Goose

Krystyna Gesiak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERLINGIERI, CHRISTOPHER JAMES

Attorney at Berlingieri Law, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

TRACY, ROBERT J

Attorney at Gibnney, Anthony & Flaherty, LLP

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE for Defendants Krystyna Gesiak and 125 Wythe, Inc.

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE for Defendants Krystyna Gesiak and 125 Wythe, Inc.; Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Tracy, R.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Tracy, R.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE for Defendants Krystyna Gesiak and 125 Wythe, Inc.; Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Berlingieri, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less