This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 23:22:13 (UTC).

Charles W. Jacobs v. Cobra Industrial Maintenance, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 Charles W Jacobs filed an Other lawsuit against Cobra Industrial Maintenance, LLC. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank Caruso. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank Caruso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles W Jacobs

Defendants

GLOBE METALLURGICAL INC

COBRA INDUSTRIAL MAINTENANCE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY, WILLIAM DAVID

Attorney at MAXWELL MURPHY, LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) signed

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT of Petitioner Charles W. Jacobs

AFFIDAVIT of Petitioner Charles W. Jacobs; Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP of William D. Murphy, Esq.

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP of William D. Murphy, Esq.; Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

PETITION for Pre-Suit Discovery

PETITION for Pre-Suit Discovery; Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT of Petitioner Charles W. Jacobs; Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP of William D. Murphy, Esq.; Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION for Pre-Suit Discovery; Filed By: Murphy, W.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less